Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Elections Supervisors

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0963 /CH0725 (SB0459/CH0726)
Title
Campaign Finance - Ballot Issue Committees - Prospective Questions
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1028 /CH0227 (SB0682/CH0226)
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1032
Title
Montgomery County Board of Education - Elections - Voting by County Residents MC 25-16
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1077 /CH0295
Title
Montgomery County Board of Elections - Election Director - Appointment Requirement MC 26-16
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1186
Title
Sex Offender Registrants - School Polling Place - Alternative
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1259
Title
Election Law - Voting by Registered Offenders at Polling Places - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0169 /CH0357
Title
Special Elections - Voting by Mail - Canvass of Votes
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0459 /CH0726 (HB0963/CH0725)
Title
Campaign Finance - Ballot Issue Committees - Prospective Questions
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0682 /CH0226 (HB1028/CH0227)
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0963 /CH0725 (SB0459/CH0726) Campaign Finance - Ballot Issue Committees - Prospective Questions Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 725
Ways and Means
3/02/2016 - 2:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1028 /CH0227 (SB0682/CH0226) Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 227
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1032 Montgomery County Board of Education - Elections - Voting by County Residents MC 25-16 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1077 /CH0295 Montgomery County Board of Elections - Election Director - Appointment Requirement MC 26-16 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 295
Ways and Means
3/02/2016 - 2:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1186 Sex Offender Registrants - School Polling Place - Alternative Delegate Angel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1259 Election Law - Voting by Registered Offenders at Polling Places - Prohibition Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0169 /CH0357 Special Elections - Voting by Mail - Canvass of Votes Senator Kagan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 357
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/04/2016 - 3:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0459 /CH0726 (HB0963/CH0725) Campaign Finance - Ballot Issue Committees - Prospective Questions Senator Conway 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 726
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0682 /CH0226 (HB1028/CH0227) Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 226
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM