Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Elections Supervisors

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0063
Title
Elections - Ballots - Random Ordering of Names
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1331 /CH0524
Title
Election Law - Cybersecurity
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1427
Title
Election Law – Use of Ballot Marking Devices
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1563
Title
Election Law - Qualification of Voters - Proof of Identity
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0190
Title
Election Law - International Election Observers
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0357
Title
Voter Registration Integrity Act of 2018
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0547
Title
Election Law - Elections by Mail
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0063 Elections - Ballots - Random Ordering of Names Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/25/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1331 /CH0524 Election Law - Cybersecurity Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 524
Ways and Means
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1427 Election Law – Use of Ballot Marking Devices Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1563 Election Law - Qualification of Voters - Proof of Identity Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0190 Election Law - International Election Observers Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/30/2018 - 2:00 PM
SB0357 Voter Registration Integrity Act of 2018 Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0547 Election Law - Elections by Mail Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM