Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Electronic Commerce -see also- Electronic Funds Transfer

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0083 /CH0585 (SB0240)
Title
Maryland Trust Act
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0098 (SB0154/CH0042)
Title
Commercial Law - Interference With Internet Ticket Sales - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0244 (SB0776)
Title
Libraries - Electronic Book Licenses and Sales - Discriminatory Practices
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0801 (SB0368)
Title
Commission on Maryland Cybersecurity Innovation and Excellence - Membership, Duties, and Termination Date
Sponsor
Delegate Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0830 (SB0287)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Shipment of Kosher Wine Sold at Retail
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0877
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Qualified Maryland Toll Expenses
Sponsor
Delegate Weir
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1160 (SB0919)
Title
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1254
Title
Environment - Dental Amalgam - Reduction in Use
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1352 /CH0654 (SB0964)
Title
Secretary of State and Attorney General - Charitable Enforcement and Protection of Charitable Assets
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1365
Title
Corporations and Associations - Securities - Maryland Small Business Funding Act
Sponsor
Delegate Schuh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0100 /CH0027
Title
Insurance - Premiums and Charges - Review of Administrative Expenses
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0154 /CH0042 (HB0098)
Title
Commercial Law - Interference With Internet Ticket Sales - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0240 (HB0083/CH0585)
Title
Maryland Trust Act
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0287 (HB0830)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Shipment of Kosher Wine Sold at Retail
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0368 (HB0801)
Title
Commission on Maryland Cybersecurity Innovation and Excellence - Membership and Termination Date
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0374 /CH0293
Title
State Lottery - Task Force to Study Lottery Revenue
Sponsor
Senator Currie
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0776 (HB0244)
Title
Libraries - Electronic Book Licenses and Sales - Discriminatory Practices
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0919 (HB1160)
Title
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0964 (HB1352/CH0654)
Title
Secretary of State and Attorney General - Charitable Enforcement and Protection of Charitable Assets
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0083 /CH0585 (SB0240) Maryland Trust Act Delegate Simmons 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 585
Judiciary
1/22/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0098 (SB0154/CH0042) Commercial Law - Interference With Internet Ticket Sales - Prohibition Delegate Arora 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0244 (SB0776) Libraries - Electronic Book Licenses and Sales - Discriminatory Practices Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0801 (SB0368) Commission on Maryland Cybersecurity Innovation and Excellence - Membership, Duties, and Termination Date Delegate Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0830 (SB0287) Alcoholic Beverages - Shipment of Kosher Wine Sold at Retail Delegate Arora 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0877 Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Qualified Maryland Toll Expenses Delegate Weir 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1160 (SB0919) Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services - Establishment Delegate Barnes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1254 Environment - Dental Amalgam - Reduction in Use Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1352 /CH0654 (SB0964) Secretary of State and Attorney General - Charitable Enforcement and Protection of Charitable Assets Delegate Morhaim 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 654
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1365 Corporations and Associations - Securities - Maryland Small Business Funding Act Delegate Schuh 2 2 In the House - Hearing cancelled
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0100 /CH0027 Insurance - Premiums and Charges - Review of Administrative Expenses Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 27
Finance
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0154 /CH0042 (HB0098) Commercial Law - Interference With Internet Ticket Sales - Prohibition Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 42
Finance
1/22/2014 - 1:45 PM
Economic Matters
SB0240 (HB0083/CH0585) Maryland Trust Act Senator Stone 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0287 (HB0830) Alcoholic Beverages - Shipment of Kosher Wine Sold at Retail Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0368 (HB0801) Commission on Maryland Cybersecurity Innovation and Excellence - Membership and Termination Date Senator Pugh 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (126-6)
Finance
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0374 /CH0293 State Lottery - Task Force to Study Lottery Revenue Senator Currie 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 293
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0776 (HB0244) Libraries - Electronic Book Licenses and Sales - Discriminatory Practices Senator Montgomery 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0919 (HB1160) Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services - Establishment Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0964 (HB1352/CH0654) Secretary of State and Attorney General - Charitable Enforcement and Protection of Charitable Assets Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM