Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Electronic Commerce -see also- Electronic Funds Transfer

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0108 (SB0037)
Title
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0209
Title
Howard County - Room Rental Tax - Room Rental Fee Ho. Co. 12-15
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0670 (SB0700)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Transfers
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0699 (SB0434)
Title
Commercial Insurance and Workers' Compensation Insurance - Notice of Premium Increase
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0726
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Online Sales Presumption
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0744 /CH0453
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - "Mug Shot" Web Sites
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0760 (SB0557)
Title
Food Fish and Shellfish - Labeling and Identification Requirements (Maryland Seafood Authenticity Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0786 /CH0103 (SB0613)
Title
Self-Service Storage Facilities - Enforcement of Lien - Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0972
Title
Insurance - Transportation Network Insurance - Requirements and Coverage
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1065 (SB0190)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Taxable Price - Accommodations
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1078 (SB0559)
Title
Vehicle Law - Dealers' Facilities - Internet Locations
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1231 (SB0868/CH0204)
Title
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1255 (SB0936)
Title
Maryland Locksmith Act - Public Lists of Licensees - Remedies for Violations
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0037 (HB0108)
Title
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0190 (HB1065)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Taxable Price - Accommodations
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0434 (HB0699)
Title
Commercial Insurance and Workers' Compensation Insurance - Notice of Premium Increase
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0557 (HB0760)
Title
Food Fish and Shellfish - Labeling and Identification Requirements (Maryland Seafood Authenticity Act)
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0559 (HB1078)
Title
Vehicle Law - Dealers' Facilities - Internet Locations
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0608
Title
Property and Casualty Insurance - Notices, Policies, and Proof of Insurance - Electronic Format
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0613 (HB0786/CH0103)
Title
Self-Service Storage Facilities - Enforcement of Lien - Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0700 (HB0670)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Transfers
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0868 /CH0204 (HB1231)
Title
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services and For-Hire Transportation
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0936 (HB1255)
Title
Maryland Locksmith Act - Public Lists of Licensees - Remedies for Violations
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0108 (SB0037) Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0209 Howard County - Room Rental Tax - Room Rental Fee Ho. Co. 12-15 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 1 of 2016
Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2015 - 2:00 PM
HB0670 (SB0700) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Transfers Delegate Frick 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0699 (SB0434) Commercial Insurance and Workers' Compensation Insurance - Notice of Premium Increase Delegate Jameson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0726 Sales and Use Tax - Online Sales Presumption Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0744 /CH0453 Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - "Mug Shot" Web Sites Delegate Carter 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 453
Economic Matters
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0760 (SB0557) Food Fish and Shellfish - Labeling and Identification Requirements (Maryland Seafood Authenticity Act) Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0786 /CH0103 (SB0613) Self-Service Storage Facilities - Enforcement of Lien - Procedures Delegate Davis 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103
Economic Matters
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0972 Insurance - Transportation Network Insurance - Requirements and Coverage Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB1065 (SB0190) Sales and Use Tax - Taxable Price - Accommodations Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1078 (SB0559) Vehicle Law - Dealers' Facilities - Internet Locations Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1231 (SB0868/CH0204) Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/13 at 9:45 a.m.
Economic Matters
4/13/2015 - 9:45 AM
HB1255 (SB0936) Maryland Locksmith Act - Public Lists of Licensees - Remedies for Violations Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0037 (HB0108) Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
2/04/2015 - 2:00 PM
Finance
SB0190 (HB1065) Sales and Use Tax - Taxable Price - Accommodations Senator Madaleno 2 2 Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 3 of 2016
Budget and Taxation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0434 (HB0699) Commercial Insurance and Workers' Compensation Insurance - Notice of Premium Increase Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0557 (HB0760) Food Fish and Shellfish - Labeling and Identification Requirements (Maryland Seafood Authenticity Act) Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0559 (HB1078) Vehicle Law - Dealers' Facilities - Internet Locations Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0608 Property and Casualty Insurance - Notices, Policies, and Proof of Insurance - Electronic Format Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0613 (HB0786/CH0103) Self-Service Storage Facilities - Enforcement of Lien - Procedures Senator Astle 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Finance
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0700 (HB0670) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Transfers Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0868 /CH0204 (HB1231) Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services and For-Hire Transportation Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 204
Finance
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0936 (HB1255) Maryland Locksmith Act - Public Lists of Licensees - Remedies for Violations Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM