Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Electronic Commerce -see also- Electronic Funds Transfer

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0813 /CH0447 (SB0438/CH0448)
Title
State Lottery Tickets - Internet Sales - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0965 (SB0552)
Title
Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Security Breach Notification Requirements - Modifications
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0974 /CH0518 (SB0525)
Title
Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1114 (SB0892)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Nontransferable Ticketing Systems
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1364
Title
State Government - eCheck Payments - Prohibition on Convenience Fee
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0311 /CH0588 (HB0426/CH0589)
Title
Promoting Efficiencies in State Procurement
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0438 /CH0448 (HB0813/CH0447)
Title
State Lottery Tickets - Internet Sales - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0463
Title
Business Regulation - Limited Residential Lodging
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0525 (HB0974/CH0518)
Title
Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0552 (HB0965)
Title
Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Security Breach Notification Requirements - Modifications
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0892 (HB1114)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Nontransferable Ticketing Systems
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1200
Title
Internet Consumer Privacy Rights Act of 2017
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0813 /CH0447 (SB0438/CH0448) State Lottery Tickets - Internet Sales - Prohibition Delegate Bromwell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 447
Ways and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0965 (SB0552) Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Security Breach Notification Requirements - Modifications Delegate Howard, S. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0974 /CH0518 (SB0525) Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions Delegate Carey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 518
Economic Matters
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1114 (SB0892) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Nontransferable Ticketing Systems Delegate Frick 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1364 State Government - eCheck Payments - Prohibition on Convenience Fee Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0311 /CH0588 (HB0426/CH0589) Promoting Efficiencies in State Procurement President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 588
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0438 /CH0448 (HB0813/CH0447) State Lottery Tickets - Internet Sales - Prohibition Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 448
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0463 Business Regulation - Limited Residential Lodging Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0525 (HB0974/CH0518) Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0552 (HB0965) Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Security Breach Notification Requirements - Modifications Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0892 (HB1114) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Nontransferable Ticketing Systems Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1200 Internet Consumer Privacy Rights Act of 2017 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - Referred Economic Matters
Finance
4/06/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM