Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Electronic Commerce -see also- Electronic Funds Transfer

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0092 /CH0043 (SB0113/CH0044)
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Payment of Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0141
Title
Commercial Law - Internet Privacy and Net Neutrality
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0426
Title
21st Century Transportation Funding Act
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0777 /CH0296 (SB0694)
Title
Commercial Law – Credit Card Processors – Merchant Processing Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0884 /CH0704
Title
Sales and Use Tax – Short–Term Rentals
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0889
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Qualified Maryland Toll Expenses
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1301 /CH0735 (SB0728)
Title
Taxation of Online Sales – Marketplace Facilitators and Sellers of Other Tobacco Products
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0095 /CH0261
Title
Natural Resources – Recreational License Donation Program and Fund – Program Extension and Fund Name Change
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0113 /CH0044 (HB0092/CH0043)
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Payment of Fees
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0137 /CH0289
Title
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0414
Title
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0533 /CH0758
Title
Sales and Use Tax – Short–Term Rentals
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0694 (HB0777/CH0296)
Title
Commercial Law – Credit Card Processors – Merchant Processing Agreements
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0728 (HB1301/CH0735)
Title
Taxation of Online Sales – Marketplace Facilitators and Sellers of Other Tobacco Products
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0092 /CH0043 (SB0113/CH0044) Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Payment of Fees Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 43
Judiciary
2/25/2019 - 10:00 AM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0141 Commercial Law - Internet Privacy and Net Neutrality Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0426 21st Century Transportation Funding Act Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0777 /CH0296 (SB0694) Commercial Law – Credit Card Processors – Merchant Processing Agreements Delegate Howard 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 296
Economic Matters
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0884 /CH0704 Sales and Use Tax – Short–Term Rentals Delegate Mosby 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 704
Ways and Means
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0889 Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Qualified Maryland Toll Expenses Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1301 /CH0735 (SB0728) Taxation of Online Sales – Marketplace Facilitators and Sellers of Other Tobacco Products Delegate Walker 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 735
Ways and Means
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0095 /CH0261 Natural Resources – Recreational License Donation Program and Fund – Program Extension and Fund Name Change Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 261
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0113 /CH0044 (HB0092/CH0043) Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Payment of Fees Senator Hough 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 44
Judicial Proceedings
2/05/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0137 /CH0289 Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 289
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2019 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0414 Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0533 /CH0758 Sales and Use Tax – Short–Term Rentals Senator Guzzone 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 758
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/04/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0694 (HB0777/CH0296) Commercial Law – Credit Card Processors – Merchant Processing Agreements Senator Kramer 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Finance
3/12/2019 - 9:00 AM
Economic Matters
SB0728 (HB1301/CH0735) Taxation of Online Sales – Marketplace Facilitators and Sellers of Other Tobacco Products Senator Guzzone 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:23 PM