Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Electronic Commerce -see also- Electronic Funds Transfer

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0137
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Procurement Improvement Council - Duties and Report on eMaryland Marketplace
Sponsor
Delegate Charles
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0553
Title
State Lottery Tickets - Prohibition on Internet Sales - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0940
Title
Gaming - Regulation of Fantasy Gaming Competitions and Implementation of Sports Wagering - Supplementary Appropriation
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1057
Title
Sales and Use Tax – Rate Reduction
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1200 (SB0787)
Title
Digital Advertising Gross Revenues Tax - Exemption and Restriction
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1209
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Peer-to-Peer Car Sharing - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1214
Title
Procurement - Transparency and Application to County Contracts
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1235
Title
Commercial Law – Consumer Protection – Entertainment Events and Ticketing Practices
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1318
Title
Maryland Business Tax Relief Act
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1324 (SB0883)
Title
Tobacco Tax and Sales and Use Tax - Out-of-State Sales of Premium Cigars and Pipe Tobacco and Tobacco Smoking Devices
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1351
Title
Campaign Finance - Contribution Through Third-Party Payment Processor and Payment of Expenses
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1352
Title
Campaign Finance Reports - Business Contributors - Registration Status
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0219 /CH0100
Title
Financial Institutions – Commissioner of Financial Regulation – Money Transmissions
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0251 /CH0101
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Licensing of Nondepository Institutions - Elimination of Paper License Requirements
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0787 (HB1200)
Title
Digital Advertising Gross Revenues, Income, Sales and Use, and Tobacco Taxes - Alterations and Implementation
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0837
Title
Health - Advance Care Planning and Advance Directives
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0883 (HB1324)
Title
Tobacco Tax and Sales and Use Tax - Out-of-State Sales of Premium Cigars and Pipe Tobacco and Tobacco Smoking Devices
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0137 State Finance and Procurement - Procurement Improvement Council - Duties and Report on eMaryland Marketplace Delegate Charles 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
1/28/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0553 State Lottery Tickets - Prohibition on Internet Sales - Repeal Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0940 Gaming - Regulation of Fantasy Gaming Competitions and Implementation of Sports Wagering - Supplementary Appropriation Speaker 6 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Ways and Means
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1057 Sales and Use Tax – Rate Reduction Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1200 (SB0787) Digital Advertising Gross Revenues Tax - Exemption and Restriction Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1209 Sales and Use Tax - Peer-to-Peer Car Sharing - Alterations Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1214 Procurement - Transparency and Application to County Contracts Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1235 Commercial Law – Consumer Protection – Entertainment Events and Ticketing Practices Delegate Brooks 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1318 Maryland Business Tax Relief Act Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1324 (SB0883) Tobacco Tax and Sales and Use Tax - Out-of-State Sales of Premium Cigars and Pipe Tobacco and Tobacco Smoking Devices Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Ways and Means
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
Budget and Taxation
HB1351 Campaign Finance - Contribution Through Third-Party Payment Processor and Payment of Expenses Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1352 Campaign Finance Reports - Business Contributors - Registration Status Delegate Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0219 /CH0100 Financial Institutions – Commissioner of Financial Regulation – Money Transmissions Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 100
Finance
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0251 /CH0101 Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Licensing of Nondepository Institutions - Elimination of Paper License Requirements Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 101
Finance
2/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0787 (HB1200) Digital Advertising Gross Revenues, Income, Sales and Use, and Tobacco Taxes - Alterations and Implementation Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Budget and Taxation
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0837 Health - Advance Care Planning and Advance Directives Senator Kramer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Finance
3/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0883 (HB1324) Tobacco Tax and Sales and Use Tax - Out-of-State Sales of Premium Cigars and Pipe Tobacco and Tobacco Smoking Devices Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Budget and Taxation
3/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Ways and Means
3/30/2021 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/14/2021 10:24 AM
Click to return on the top page