Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Electronic Funds Transfer

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0476 /CH0541 (SB0614/CH0540)
Title
Frederick County - Payment of Wages
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0564 (SB0522/CH0302)
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Uniform Commercial Code - Funds Transfers
Sponsor
Delegate Olszewski
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0723 /CH0421
Title
Money Transmission - Protection From Financial Abuse, Financial Exploitation, and Fraud - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1263
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Chesapeake Bay Bridge - Toll Collection
Sponsor
Delegate McConkey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0100 /CH0027
Title
Insurance - Premiums and Charges - Review of Administrative Expenses
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0522 /CH0302 (HB0564)
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Uniform Commercial Code - Funds Transfers
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0614 /CH0540 (HB0476/CH0541)
Title
Frederick County - Payment of Wages
Sponsor
Senator Brinkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0476 /CH0541 (SB0614/CH0540) Frederick County - Payment of Wages Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 541
Economic Matters
2/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0564 (SB0522/CH0302) Commercial Law - Maryland Uniform Commercial Code - Funds Transfers Delegate Olszewski 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0723 /CH0421 Money Transmission - Protection From Financial Abuse, Financial Exploitation, and Fraud - Requirements Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 421
Economic Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1263 Maryland Transportation Authority - Chesapeake Bay Bridge - Toll Collection Delegate McConkey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0100 /CH0027 Insurance - Premiums and Charges - Review of Administrative Expenses Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 27
Finance
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0522 /CH0302 (HB0564) Commercial Law - Maryland Uniform Commercial Code - Funds Transfers Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 302
Finance
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0614 /CH0540 (HB0476/CH0541) Frederick County - Payment of Wages Senator Brinkley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 540
Finance
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM