Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Electronic Funds Transfer

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0035
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Chesapeake Bay Bridge - Toll Collection
Sponsor
Delegate McConkey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0240
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Toll Rates
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0300 (SB1108)
Title
Video Lottery Terminals - Disposition of Unclaimed Winnings
Sponsor
Delegate Fennell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0523 /CH0107
Title
E-ZPass Accounts - Transponder Theft - Reporting and Unauthorized Charges
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0639 /CH0109
Title
Health Insurance - Provider Claims - Payment by Credit Card or Electronic Funds Transfer Payment Method
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0088 /CH0341
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consolidation of Nondepository Special Funds
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0697
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Purchase of Beer by Retail Dealers From Manufacturers and Wholesalers
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0880
Title
Task Force to Study Welfare Reform in Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1108 (HB0300)
Title
Video Lottery Terminals - Disposition of Unclaimed Winnings
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0035 Maryland Transportation Authority - Chesapeake Bay Bridge - Toll Collection Delegate McConkey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
1/28/2016 - 1:30 PM
HB0240 Maryland Transportation Authority - Toll Rates Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2016 - 1:30 PM
HB0300 (SB1108) Video Lottery Terminals - Disposition of Unclaimed Winnings Delegate Fennell 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0523 /CH0107 E-ZPass Accounts - Transponder Theft - Reporting and Unauthorized Charges Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 107
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0639 /CH0109 Health Insurance - Provider Claims - Payment by Credit Card or Electronic Funds Transfer Payment Method Delegate Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 109
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0088 /CH0341 Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consolidation of Nondepository Special Funds Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 341
Finance
1/14/2016 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0697 Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Purchase of Beer by Retail Dealers From Manufacturers and Wholesalers Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0880 Task Force to Study Welfare Reform in Maryland Senator Jennings 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1108 (HB0300) Video Lottery Terminals - Disposition of Unclaimed Winnings Senator Salling 2 2 In the House - Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Budget and Taxation
3/17/2016 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
4/11/2016 - 9:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM