Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Electronic Funds Transfer

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0049
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Chesapeake Bay Bridge - Toll Collection
Sponsor
Delegate McConkey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0300 /CH0451
Title
Video Lottery Terminals - Disposition of Unclaimed Winnings
Sponsor
Delegate Fennell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1196
Title
Video Lottery Facilities - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Targeted Areas
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1364
Title
State Government - eCheck Payments - Prohibition on Convenience Fee
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1092
Title
Public Assistance Fraud Prevention Act
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0049 Maryland Transportation Authority - Chesapeake Bay Bridge - Toll Collection Delegate McConkey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
1/26/2017 - 2:00 PM
HB0300 /CH0451 Video Lottery Terminals - Disposition of Unclaimed Winnings Delegate Fennell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 451
Ways and Means
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1196 Video Lottery Facilities - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Targeted Areas Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB1364 State Government - eCheck Payments - Prohibition on Convenience Fee Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1092 Public Assistance Fraud Prevention Act Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM