Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Electronic Funds Transfer

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0752 (SB0034)
Title
Consumer Protection - Scanning or Swiping Identification Cards and Driver's Licenses - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0855
Title
Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Money Transmissions
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1380
Title
Campaign Finance - Contribution Through Third-Party Payment Processor - Transfer to Campaign Account
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0034 (HB0752)
Title
Consumer Protection - Scanning or Swiping Identification Cards and Driver's Licenses - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0754
Title
Financial Institutions - Consumer Protection - Money Transmissions and Virtual Currencies
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0752 (SB0034) Consumer Protection - Scanning or Swiping Identification Cards and Driver's Licenses - Prohibition Delegate Crosby 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0855 Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Money Transmissions Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed
Economic Matters
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1380 Campaign Finance - Contribution Through Third-Party Payment Processor - Transfer to Campaign Account Delegate Mosby 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0034 (HB0752) Consumer Protection - Scanning or Swiping Identification Cards and Driver's Licenses - Prohibition Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
1/29/2020 - 2:45 PM
SB0754 Financial Institutions - Consumer Protection - Money Transmissions and Virtual Currencies Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Finance
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/18/2020 7:06 AM