Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Electronic Funds Transfer

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1351
Title
Campaign Finance - Contribution Through Third-Party Payment Processor and Payment of Expenses
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0219 /CH0100
Title
Financial Institutions – Commissioner of Financial Regulation – Money Transmissions
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0251 /CH0101
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Licensing of Nondepository Institutions - Elimination of Paper License Requirements
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0893 /CH0065
Title
Unemployment - Insurance Revisions and Special Enrollment Period for Health Benefits
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1351 Campaign Finance - Contribution Through Third-Party Payment Processor and Payment of Expenses Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0219 /CH0100 Financial Institutions – Commissioner of Financial Regulation – Money Transmissions Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 100
Finance
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0251 /CH0101 Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Licensing of Nondepository Institutions - Elimination of Paper License Requirements Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 101
Finance
2/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0893 /CH0065 Unemployment - Insurance Revisions and Special Enrollment Period for Health Benefits Senator Rosapepe 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 65
Finance
3/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 4:21 PM
Click to return on the top page