Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Electricians

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0270 (SB0350/CH0237)
Title
Electrical Inspectors and Plumbing Inspectors - Master License Required
Sponsor
Delegate Haddaway-Riccio
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1386 (SB0916/CH0579)
Title
Task Force to Study Licensing and Continuing Education Requirements for Electricians
Sponsor
Delegate Haddaway-Riccio
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0350 /CH0237 (HB0270)
Title
Electrical Inspectors and Plumbing Inspectors - Master License Required
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0916 /CH0579 (HB1386)
Title
Task Force to Study Licensing and Continuing Education Requirements for Electricians
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0270 (SB0350/CH0237) Electrical Inspectors and Plumbing Inspectors - Master License Required Delegate Haddaway-Riccio 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/07/2013 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1386 (SB0916/CH0579) Task Force to Study Licensing and Continuing Education Requirements for Electricians Delegate Haddaway-Riccio 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Economic Matters
Rules
SB0350 /CH0237 (HB0270) Electrical Inspectors and Plumbing Inspectors - Master License Required Senator Colburn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 237
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0916 /CH0579 (HB1386) Task Force to Study Licensing and Continuing Education Requirements for Electricians Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 579
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM
Click to return on the top page