Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Electricians

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0164
Title
Business Occupations and Professions - Licensing and Regulation of Electricians
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0792
Title
Maryland Electricians Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0905
Title
Electricians - Low-Voltage Electricians, Continuing Education, and Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1113 /CH0510 (SB0640/CH0511)
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0021
Title
Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - State Occupational Mechanical Licensing Boards' Fund - Elevator Safety Review Board
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0033 /CH0746
Title
Baltimore City - Home Inspectors - Residential Rental Inspections
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0640 /CH0511 (HB1113/CH0510)
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0164 Business Occupations and Professions - Licensing and Regulation of Electricians Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0792 Maryland Electricians Act - Revisions Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0905 Electricians - Low-Voltage Electricians, Continuing Education, and Penalties Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1113 /CH0510 (SB0640/CH0511) State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act Delegate Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Appropriations
3/01/2019 - 1:30 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules
SB0021 Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - State Occupational Mechanical Licensing Boards' Fund - Elevator Safety Review Board Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Failed (22-25)
Finance
1/24/2019 - 2:30 PM
SB0033 /CH0746 Baltimore City - Home Inspectors - Residential Rental Inspections Senator McCray 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 746
Finance
1/31/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/03/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0640 /CH0511 (HB1113/CH0510) State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 511
Rules
3/05/2019 - 11:30 AM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:23 PM