Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Electricians

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0058 (SB0386)
Title
Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0254
Title
Prince George's County - Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies PG 403-20
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1127 (SB0994)
Title
Maryland Electricians Act of 2020
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0016
Title
Business Occupations and Professions - Master Electricians Guaranty Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0386 (HB0058)
Title
Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0991
Title
Apprenticeship and Training Council – Journeyworker–Apprentice Ratios – Electrical Craft or Trade
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0994 (HB1127)
Title
Department of Labor – Electricians – State Licensing Workgroup
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0058 (SB0386) Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0254 Prince George's County - Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies PG 403-20 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1127 (SB0994) Maryland Electricians Act of 2020 Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/21/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0016 Business Occupations and Professions - Master Electricians Guaranty Fund - Establishment Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/22/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0386 (HB0058) Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0991 Apprenticeship and Training Council – Journeyworker–Apprentice Ratios – Electrical Craft or Trade Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0994 (HB1127) Department of Labor – Electricians – State Licensing Workgroup Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/18/2020 5:55 PM