Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Electrologists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0251 /CH0258 (SB0320/CH0154)
Title
State Board of Nursing - Electrology Practice Committee - Membership
Sponsor
Delegate Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0908 /CH0560 (SB0849/CH0559)
Title
State Board of Nursing - Nurses, Nursing Assistants, Medication Technicians, and Electrologists - Licensing, Certification, Regulation, Violations, and Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1456 /CH0457
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Board of Review - Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0320 /CH0154 (HB0251/CH0258)
Title
State Board of Nursing - Electrology Practice Committee - Membership
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0849 /CH0559 (HB0908/CH0560)
Title
State Board of Nursing - Nurses, Nursing Assistants, Medication Technicians, and Electrologists - Licensing, Certification, Regulation, Violations, and Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0251 /CH0258 (SB0320/CH0154) State Board of Nursing - Electrology Practice Committee - Membership Delegate Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 258
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0908 /CH0560 (SB0849/CH0559) State Board of Nursing - Nurses, Nursing Assistants, Medication Technicians, and Electrologists - Licensing, Certification, Regulation, Violations, and Penalties Delegate Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 560
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1456 /CH0457 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Board of Review - Jurisdiction Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 457
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0320 /CH0154 (HB0251/CH0258) State Board of Nursing - Electrology Practice Committee - Membership Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 154
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0849 /CH0559 (HB0908/CH0560) State Board of Nursing - Nurses, Nursing Assistants, Medication Technicians, and Electrologists - Licensing, Certification, Regulation, Violations, and Penalties Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 559
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM