Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Electronic Surveillance -see also- Wiretapping

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0116 /CH0039 (SB0267/CH0038)
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Interception of Communications - Abuse or Neglect of Vulnerable Adult and Medicaid Fraud
Sponsor
Delegate Mitchell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0377
Title
Criminal Procedure - Court Order - Location of Mobile Communications Device
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0682
Title
Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0887
Title
Criminal Procedure - Search Warrants - Location Privacy
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1233
Title
Criminal Procedure - Law Enforcement Agencies - Use of Drones
Sponsor
Delegate George
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1372 /CH0430 (SB0934)
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1453
Title
Criminal Law - Marijuana - Regulation, Penalties, and Taxation
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0122
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2011 - Prince George's County - Community Safety and Surveillance Systems
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0182
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Activation of Audio Recording Devices on Vehicles Used for Transit Service - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0267 /CH0038 (HB0116/CH0039)
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Interception of Communications - Abuse or Neglect of Vulnerable Adult and Medicaid Fraud
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0934 (HB1372/CH0430)
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1006
Title
Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax - Prohibited Acts
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0116 /CH0039 (SB0267/CH0038) Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Interception of Communications - Abuse or Neglect of Vulnerable Adult and Medicaid Fraud Delegate Mitchell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39
Judiciary
1/29/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0377 Criminal Procedure - Court Order - Location of Mobile Communications Device Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0682 Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - Prohibition Delegate Ready 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0887 Criminal Procedure - Search Warrants - Location Privacy Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1233 Criminal Procedure - Law Enforcement Agencies - Use of Drones Delegate George 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1372 /CH0430 (SB0934) Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations Delegate Jones 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1453 Criminal Law - Marijuana - Regulation, Penalties, and Taxation Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0122 Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2011 - Prince George's County - Community Safety and Surveillance Systems Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0182 Maryland Transit Administration - Activation of Audio Recording Devices on Vehicles Used for Transit Service - Prohibition Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Madaleno)
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0267 /CH0038 (HB0116/CH0039) Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Interception of Communications - Abuse or Neglect of Vulnerable Adult and Medicaid Fraud Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 38
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0934 (HB1372/CH0430) Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1006 Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax - Prohibited Acts Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM