Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Electronic Surveillance -see also- Wiretapping

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0115
Title
Task Force to Study Firearms and Global Positioning Satellite (GPS) Devices
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0116
Title
Public Safety - Law Enforcement Officers - Video Cameras
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0277
Title
Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0289 (SB0699/CH0192)
Title
Automatic License Plate Readers and Captured Plate Data - Authorized Uses
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0633
Title
Baltimore City - Law Enforcement Officers - Video Cameras
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0785
Title
Drones - Unauthorized Surveillance
Sponsor
Delegate George
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0847 (SB0926)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Government Drone Use - Limitations
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0912 /CH0242 (SB0924)
Title
Courts - Electronic Communications - Privacy
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0924 (SB0950)
Title
Consumer Protection - Monitoring Consumer Behavior and Shopping Habits - Required Notice
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1074
Title
Fourth Amendment Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1161 (SB0698/CH0191)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Electronic Device Location Information - Order
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0239
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Audio Recordings - Requirements and Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0350 /CH0490
Title
Speed Monitoring Systems Reform Act of 2014
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0698 /CH0191 (HB1161)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Electronic Device Location Information - Order
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0699 /CH0192 (HB0289)
Title
Automatic License Plate Readers and Captured Plate Data - Authorized Uses
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0924 (HB0912/CH0242)
Title
Courts - Electronic Communications - Privacy
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0926 (HB0847)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Government Drone Use - Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0950 (HB0924)
Title
Consumer Protection - Monitoring Consumer Behavior and Shopping Habits - Required Notice
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0115 Task Force to Study Firearms and Global Positioning Satellite (GPS) Devices Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0116 Public Safety - Law Enforcement Officers - Video Cameras Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0277 Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - Prohibition Delegate Ready 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 2:15 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/06/2014 - 2:15 PM
HB0289 (SB0699/CH0192) Automatic License Plate Readers and Captured Plate Data - Authorized Uses Delegate Carr 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0633 Baltimore City - Law Enforcement Officers - Video Cameras Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0785 Drones - Unauthorized Surveillance Delegate George 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0847 (SB0926) Criminal Procedure - Government Drone Use - Limitations Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0912 /CH0242 (SB0924) Courts - Electronic Communications - Privacy Delegate Smigiel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 242
Judiciary
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0924 (SB0950) Consumer Protection - Monitoring Consumer Behavior and Shopping Habits - Required Notice Delegate Arora 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1074 Fourth Amendment Protection Act Delegate Smigiel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1161 (SB0698/CH0191) Criminal Procedure - Electronic Device Location Information - Order Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0239 Maryland Transit Administration - Audio Recordings - Requirements and Limitations Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0350 /CH0490 Speed Monitoring Systems Reform Act of 2014 Senator Brochin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 490
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0698 /CH0191 (HB1161) Criminal Procedure - Electronic Device Location Information - Order Senator Shank 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 191
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0699 /CH0192 (HB0289) Automatic License Plate Readers and Captured Plate Data - Authorized Uses Senator Shank 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 192
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0924 (HB0912/CH0242) Courts - Electronic Communications - Privacy Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0926 (HB0847) Criminal Procedure - Government Drone Use - Limitations Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0950 (HB0924) Consumer Protection - Monitoring Consumer Behavior and Shopping Habits - Required Notice Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM