Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Electronic Surveillance -see also- Wiretapping

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0308
Title
Public Safety - Law Enforcement Officers - Video Cameras
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0454 (SB0664)
Title
Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0533 /CH0129 (SB0628)
Title
Public Safety - Law Enforcement Officers - Body-Worn Digital Recording Device and Electronic Control Device
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0612
Title
Criminal Law - Stalking - Included Acts
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0620
Title
Crimes - Unmanned Aircraft Systems - Unauthorized Surveillance
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0761
Title
Criminal Law - Cyberstalking - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0866
Title
Wiretapping and Electronic Surveillance - Law Enforcement and Public Transportation - One-Party Consent for Interception of Oral Communications
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1094
Title
Consumer Protection - Monitoring Consumer Behavior and Shopping Habits - Required Notice
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0628 (HB0533/CH0129)
Title
Wiretapping and Electronic Surveillance - Body-Worn Digital Recording Device and Electronic Control Device - Exception
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0664 (HB0454)
Title
Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0800
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Audio Recordings - Requirements and Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0308 Public Safety - Law Enforcement Officers - Video Cameras Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0454 (SB0664) Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - Prohibition Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0533 /CH0129 (SB0628) Public Safety - Law Enforcement Officers - Body-Worn Digital Recording Device and Electronic Control Device Delegate Sydnor 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 129
Judiciary
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0612 Criminal Law - Stalking - Included Acts Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0620 Crimes - Unmanned Aircraft Systems - Unauthorized Surveillance Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0761 Criminal Law - Cyberstalking - Penalties Delegate Jalisi 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0866 Wiretapping and Electronic Surveillance - Law Enforcement and Public Transportation - One-Party Consent for Interception of Oral Communications Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1094 Consumer Protection - Monitoring Consumer Behavior and Shopping Habits - Required Notice Delegate Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Economic Matters
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0628 (HB0533/CH0129) Wiretapping and Electronic Surveillance - Body-Worn Digital Recording Device and Electronic Control Device - Exception Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0664 (HB0454) Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - Prohibition Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0800 Maryland Transit Administration - Audio Recordings - Requirements and Limitations Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM