Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Electronic Surveillance -see also- Wiretapping

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0004 (SB0977)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Domestic Violence - Active Electronic Monitoring (Amber's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0076 /CH0610
Title
Department of State Police - Investigation Authority
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0257 (SB0476)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Providing Electronic Device Location Information - Historical Data
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0305
Title
Consumer Protection - Monitoring Consumer Behavior and Shopping Habits - Required Notice
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0314 /CH0551 (SB0346/CH0550)
Title
Peace Orders - Grounds for Relief
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0351
Title
Criminal Procedure - Government Drone Use - Limitations
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0904
Title
Criminal Procedure - Cell Site Simulator Technology
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0196
Title
Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0199
Title
Transit and Transportation Service - Audio Recordings - Requirements and Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0213
Title
State Police - Speed Camera Revenue - Enforcement Activities
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0346 /CH0550 (HB0314/CH0551)
Title
Peace Orders - Grounds for Relief
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0402
Title
Criminal Law - First Degree Murder - Sentencing (Geraldine's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0476 (HB0257)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Providing Electronic Device Location Information - Historical Data
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0977 (HB0004)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Domestic Violence - Active Electronic Monitoring (Amber's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0004 (SB0977) Criminal Procedure - Domestic Violence - Active Electronic Monitoring (Amber's Law) Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/28/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0076 /CH0610 Department of State Police - Investigation Authority Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 610
Judiciary
1/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0257 (SB0476) Criminal Procedure - Providing Electronic Device Location Information - Historical Data Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0305 Consumer Protection - Monitoring Consumer Behavior and Shopping Habits - Required Notice Delegate Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Economic Matters
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0314 /CH0551 (SB0346/CH0550) Peace Orders - Grounds for Relief Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 551
Judiciary
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0351 Criminal Procedure - Government Drone Use - Limitations Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0904 Criminal Procedure - Cell Site Simulator Technology Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0196 Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - Prohibition Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
SB0199 Transit and Transportation Service - Audio Recordings - Requirements and Limitations Senator Brochin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0213 State Police - Speed Camera Revenue - Enforcement Activities Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0346 /CH0550 (HB0314/CH0551) Peace Orders - Grounds for Relief Senator Ramirez 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 550
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0402 Criminal Law - First Degree Murder - Sentencing (Geraldine's Law) Senator Waugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0476 (HB0257) Criminal Procedure - Providing Electronic Device Location Information - Historical Data Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0977 (HB0004) Criminal Procedure - Domestic Violence - Active Electronic Monitoring (Amber's Law) Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; Withdrawn
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM