Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Electronic Surveillance -see also- Wiretapping

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0065
Title
Criminal Procedure - Domestic Violence - Active Electronic Monitoring - Pretrial Release and Probation
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0231
Title
Prince George's County - Property Tax Credit for Security Camera Systems PG 405-18
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0314 (SB0431)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Cell Site Simulator Technology
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0328 (SB0121/CH0501)
Title
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Definition of Abuse
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0447 /CH0771 (SB1156)
Title
Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0453 (SB0209)
Title
Baltimore County - Uniformed Off-Duty Law Enforcement Officer - Body Camera
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0480 (SB0484)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0495
Title
Law Enforcement Officers - Body-Worn Cameras - Offense
Sponsor
Delegate Ali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0510
Title
Criminal Procedure - Providing Electronic Device Location Information - Historical Data
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0578
Title
Task Force to Study Law Enforcement Surveillance Technologies
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0922 /CH0211
Title
Maryland Department of Health – "Pill Mill" Tip Line and Overdose Report
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1087 /CH0338 (SB0758/CH0339)
Title
Business Regulation - Micro Markets - Licensure
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0121 /CH0501 (HB0328)
Title
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Definition of Abuse
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0209 (HB0453)
Title
Baltimore County – Uniformed Off–Duty Law Enforcement Officer – Body Camera
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0363
Title
Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0431 (HB0314)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Cell Site Simulator Technology
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0484 (HB0480)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Fees
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0577
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Prohibited Acts - Defense to Prosecution for Sale to Underage Individuals
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0758 /CH0339 (HB1087/CH0338)
Title
Business Regulation - Micro Markets - Licensure
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1156 (HB0447/CH0771)
Title
Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0065 Criminal Procedure - Domestic Violence - Active Electronic Monitoring - Pretrial Release and Probation Delegate Angel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/18/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0231 Prince George's County - Property Tax Credit for Security Camera Systems PG 405-18 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0314 (SB0431) Criminal Procedure - Cell Site Simulator Technology Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (41-3)
Judiciary
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0328 (SB0121/CH0501) Family Law - Domestic Violence - Definition of Abuse Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0447 /CH0771 (SB1156) Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund - Establishment Delegate Barron 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 771
Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Judicial Proceedings
4/05/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0453 (SB0209) Baltimore County - Uniformed Off-Duty Law Enforcement Officer - Body Camera Delegate West 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0480 (SB0484) Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Fees Delegate Mosby 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0495 Law Enforcement Officers - Body-Worn Cameras - Offense Delegate Ali 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0510 Criminal Procedure - Providing Electronic Device Location Information - Historical Data Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0578 Task Force to Study Law Enforcement Surveillance Technologies Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0922 /CH0211 Maryland Department of Health – "Pill Mill" Tip Line and Overdose Report Delegate Kipke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1087 /CH0338 (SB0758/CH0339) Business Regulation - Micro Markets - Licensure Delegate Wilson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 338
Economic Matters
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0121 /CH0501 (HB0328) Family Law - Domestic Violence - Definition of Abuse Senator Zirkin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 501
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0209 (HB0453) Baltimore County – Uniformed Off–Duty Law Enforcement Officer – Body Camera Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/01/2018 - 2:00 PM
SB0363 Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - Prohibition Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0431 (HB0314) Criminal Procedure - Cell Site Simulator Technology Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0484 (HB0480) Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Fees Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0577 Alcoholic Beverages - Prohibited Acts - Defense to Prosecution for Sale to Underage Individuals Senator Brochin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/05/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0758 /CH0339 (HB1087/CH0338) Business Regulation - Micro Markets - Licensure Senator Reilly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 339
Finance
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1156 (HB0447/CH0771) Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund - Establishment Senator Smith 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
4/05/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM