Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Electronic Surveillance -see also- Wiretapping

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0021
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Video Streaming and Archiving - Open Meetings
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0143 (SB0308)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Providing Electronic Device Location Information - Historical Data
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0183 /CH0157
Title
Prince George's County - Property Tax Credit for Security Camera Systems PG 413-19
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0187 /CH0586
Title
Prince George’s County – Speed Monitoring Systems – Maryland Route 210 (Indian Head Highway) PG 305–19
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0310
Title
Task Force to Study Impaired Driving and New Technologies
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0483 (SB0375)
Title
Service Contracts - Work Verification Clause
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0566 (SB0932)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Conditions of Pretrial Release - Home Detention Monitoring
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0776
Title
Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring Systems - Operation in School Zones
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0947
Title
Correctional Services - Female Inmate Serving Life Term - Transitional Work Release Program
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0308 (HB0143)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Providing Electronic Device Location Information - Historical Data
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0375 (HB0483)
Title
Service Contracts - Work Verification Clause
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0932 (HB0566)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Conditions of Pretrial Release - Home Detention Monitoring
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0021 Maryland Transportation Authority - Video Streaming and Archiving - Open Meetings Delegate Carr 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/05/2019 - 2:00 PM
Finance
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0143 (SB0308) Criminal Procedure - Providing Electronic Device Location Information - Historical Data Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0183 /CH0157 Prince George's County - Property Tax Credit for Security Camera Systems PG 413-19 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 157
Ways and Means
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0187 /CH0586 Prince George’s County – Speed Monitoring Systems – Maryland Route 210 (Indian Head Highway) PG 305–19 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 586
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0310 Task Force to Study Impaired Driving and New Technologies Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0483 (SB0375) Service Contracts - Work Verification Clause Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB0566 (SB0932) Criminal Procedure - Conditions of Pretrial Release - Home Detention Monitoring Delegate Mosby 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0776 Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring Systems - Operation in School Zones Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0947 Correctional Services - Female Inmate Serving Life Term - Transitional Work Release Program Delegate Bartlett 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
SB0308 (HB0143) Criminal Procedure - Providing Electronic Device Location Information - Historical Data Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0375 (HB0483) Service Contracts - Work Verification Clause Senator Zucker 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0932 (HB0566) Criminal Procedure - Conditions of Pretrial Release - Home Detention Monitoring Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 9:30 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2019 - 9:30 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:23 PM