Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Elevators

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1493 (SB1047)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Education Based Latino Outreach ADA/Elevator Project
Sponsor
Delegate Hammen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0022
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Home Wheelchair Lifts and Stairlifts
Sponsor
Senator Brinkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0082 /CH0441
Title
Elevator Safety - Third-Party Inspectors - Certification
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1047 (HB1493)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Education Based Latino Outreach ADA/Elevator Project
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1493 (SB1047) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Education Based Latino Outreach ADA/Elevator Project Delegate Hammen 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 11:00 AM
SB0022 Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Home Wheelchair Lifts and Stairlifts Senator Brinkley 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/30/2013 - 3:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0082 /CH0441 Elevator Safety - Third-Party Inspectors - Certification Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 441
Finance
1/16/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1047 (HB1493) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Education Based Latino Outreach ADA/Elevator Project Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 10:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2013 - 10:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM