Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Elevators

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0257 (SB0293/CH0288)
Title
Elevator Safety Review Board and Division of Labor and Industry - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0335 (SB0329/CH0155)
Title
Residential Cliffside Elevators - Registration and Inspection (The Jock Menzies Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Schuh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0691 (SB0605/CH0538)
Title
Property Tax Credit - Upper Stories of Commercial Structures - Rehabilitation
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0293 /CH0288 (HB0257)
Title
Elevator Safety Review Board and Division of Labor and Industry - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0329 /CH0155 (HB0335)
Title
Residential Cliffside Elevators - Registration and Inspection (The Jock Menzies Act)
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0386
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Home Wheelchair Lifts and Stairlifts
Sponsor
Senator Brinkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0605 /CH0538 (HB0691)
Title
Property Tax Credit - Commercial Structures - Rehabilitation
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0257 (SB0293/CH0288) Elevator Safety Review Board and Division of Labor and Industry - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Speaker 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0335 (SB0329/CH0155) Residential Cliffside Elevators - Registration and Inspection (The Jock Menzies Act) Delegate Schuh 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0691 (SB0605/CH0538) Property Tax Credit - Upper Stories of Commercial Structures - Rehabilitation Allegany County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0293 /CH0288 (HB0257) Elevator Safety Review Board and Division of Labor and Industry - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 288
Finance
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0329 /CH0155 (HB0335) Residential Cliffside Elevators - Registration and Inspection (The Jock Menzies Act) Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 155
Finance
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0386 Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Home Wheelchair Lifts and Stairlifts Senator Brinkley 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0605 /CH0538 (HB0691) Property Tax Credit - Commercial Structures - Rehabilitation Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 538
Budget and Taxation
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM