Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Elevators

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0117 /CH0058 (SB0190/CH0057)
Title
Elevator Safety Review Board - Sunset Extension, Program Evaluation, and Reporting Requirement
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1226 (SB0177)
Title
Public Safety - Elevator Inspections - Testing
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0177 (HB1226)
Title
Public Safety - Elevator Inspections - Testing
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0190 /CH0057 (HB0117/CH0058)
Title
Elevator Safety Review Board - Sunset Extension, Program Evaluation, and Reporting Requirement
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0117 /CH0058 (SB0190/CH0057) Elevator Safety Review Board - Sunset Extension, Program Evaluation, and Reporting Requirement Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 58
Economic Matters
1/25/2017 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1226 (SB0177) Public Safety - Elevator Inspections - Testing Delegate Wilson, C. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/06/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0177 (HB1226) Public Safety - Elevator Inspections - Testing Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0190 /CH0057 (HB0117/CH0058) Elevator Safety Review Board - Sunset Extension, Program Evaluation, and Reporting Requirement President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 57
Finance
2/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM