Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Elevators

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0310
Title
Public Safety – Elevators – Periodic Inspections
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1107 /CH0337 (SB0831)
Title
Public Safety – Elevator Inspections – Testing and Apprenticeship Program
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0831 (HB1107/CH0337)
Title
Public Safety – Elevator Inspections – Testing and Apprenticeship Program
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0310 Public Safety – Elevators – Periodic Inspections Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1107 /CH0337 (SB0831) Public Safety – Elevator Inspections – Testing and Apprenticeship Program Delegate Wilson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 337
Economic Matters
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0831 (HB1107/CH0337) Public Safety – Elevator Inspections – Testing and Apprenticeship Program Senator Middleton 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM