Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Engineers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0246 /CH0254
Title
Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - State Occupational Mechanical Licensing Boards - Fund and Fees
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0470 (SB0235/CH0230)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Service Performed by Person Practicing Engineering
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0679 /CH0296 (SB0395/CH0297)
Title
St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission - Personnel
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1062
Title
Business Occupations and Professions - Professional Engineers and Professional Land Surveyors - Revisions and Repeal of Firm Permits
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0235 /CH0230 (HB0470)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Declaration of Legislative Intent - Services
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0395 /CH0297 (HB0679/CH0296)
Title
St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission - Personnel
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0246 /CH0254 Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - State Occupational Mechanical Licensing Boards - Fund and Fees Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 254
Economic Matters
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0470 (SB0235/CH0230) Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Service Performed by Person Practicing Engineering Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0679 /CH0296 (SB0395/CH0297) St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission - Personnel St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 296
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1062 Business Occupations and Professions - Professional Engineers and Professional Land Surveyors - Revisions and Repeal of Firm Permits Delegate Miller, W. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0235 /CH0230 (HB0470) Sales and Use Tax - Declaration of Legislative Intent - Services Senator Guzzone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 230
Budget and Taxation
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0395 /CH0297 (HB0679/CH0296) St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission - Personnel Senator Waugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 297
Finance
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM