Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Enterprise Zones

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0472 /CH0119
Title
Local Government Article
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0675 /CH0134
Title
Montgomery County - Property Tax Credit for Qualified Enterprise Zone Property - Burtonsville MC 14-13
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0677 /CH0135
Title
Montgomery County - Property Tax Credit for Qualified Enterprise Zone Property - Glenmont MC 18-13
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1418
Title
Maryland Economic Development Corporation - Bonding Authority and Reporting Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Branch
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0472 /CH0119 Local Government Article Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0675 /CH0134 Montgomery County - Property Tax Credit for Qualified Enterprise Zone Property - Burtonsville MC 14-13 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 134
Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB0677 /CH0135 Montgomery County - Property Tax Credit for Qualified Enterprise Zone Property - Glenmont MC 18-13 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 135
Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB1418 Maryland Economic Development Corporation - Bonding Authority and Reporting Requirement Delegate Branch 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM