Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Enterprise Zones

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0144 /CH0586 (SB0307)
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine and Liquor Licenses MC 12-14
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0541 (SB0474)
Title
Garrett County - Enterprise Zone Property Tax Credit - Extension
Sponsor
Garrett County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0668 /CH0417
Title
Income Tax Credit - Health Enterprise Zones - Modifications
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0742 /CH0531 (SB0600/CH0530)
Title
Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0307 (HB0144/CH0586)
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine and Liquor Licenses
Sponsor
Montgomery County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0474 (HB0541)
Title
Garrett County - Enterprise Zone Property Tax Credit - Extension
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0600 /CH0530 (HB0742/CH0531)
Title
Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0144 /CH0586 (SB0307) Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine and Liquor Licenses MC 12-14 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 586
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0541 (SB0474) Garrett County - Enterprise Zone Property Tax Credit - Extension Garrett County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0668 /CH0417 Income Tax Credit - Health Enterprise Zones - Modifications Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 417
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0742 /CH0531 (SB0600/CH0530) Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program Delegate Walker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 531
Ways and Means
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0307 (HB0144/CH0586) Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine and Liquor Licenses Montgomery County Senators 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0474 (HB0541) Garrett County - Enterprise Zone Property Tax Credit - Extension Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
SB0600 /CH0530 (HB0742/CH0531) Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 530
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM