Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Enterprise Zones

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0342 /CH0129
Title
Montgomery County - Property Tax Credit for Qualified Enterprise Zone Property - Extension MC 3-17
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0394 (SB0317/CH0149)
Title
More Jobs for Marylanders Act of 2017
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0872
Title
Tax Credits - Enterprise Zones, RISE Zones, and Maryland Jobs Development Projects
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1007 (SB0364)
Title
One Maryland Economic Development Tax Credits - Business Incubators, Enterprise Zones, and Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zones
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1051 (SB1021)
Title
Enterprise Zone and Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Programs - Small Business Entities
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1284
Title
Natural Resources - Aquaculture Leases - National Historic Landmarks
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1391 (SB0801)
Title
Baltimore County - Class 5 Brewery
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0317 /CH0149 (HB0394)
Title
More Jobs for Marylanders Act of 2017
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0364 (HB1007)
Title
One Maryland Economic Development Tax Credits - Business Incubators, Enterprise Zones, and Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zones
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0801 (HB1391)
Title
Baltimore County - Class 5 Brewery
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1021 (HB1051)
Title
Job Reinvestment Act of 2017
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0342 /CH0129 Montgomery County - Property Tax Credit for Qualified Enterprise Zone Property - Extension MC 3-17 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 129
Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0394 (SB0317/CH0149) More Jobs for Marylanders Act of 2017 Speaker 3 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0872 Tax Credits - Enterprise Zones, RISE Zones, and Maryland Jobs Development Projects Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1007 (SB0364) One Maryland Economic Development Tax Credits - Business Incubators, Enterprise Zones, and Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zones Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1051 (SB1021) Enterprise Zone and Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Programs - Small Business Entities Delegate Walker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1284 Natural Resources - Aquaculture Leases - National Historic Landmarks Delegate Stein 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1391 (SB0801) Baltimore County - Class 5 Brewery Delegate Brooks 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0317 /CH0149 (HB0394) More Jobs for Marylanders Act of 2017 President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 149
Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0364 (HB1007) One Maryland Economic Development Tax Credits - Business Incubators, Enterprise Zones, and Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zones Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0801 (HB1391) Baltimore County - Class 5 Brewery Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1021 (HB1051) Job Reinvestment Act of 2017 Senator Zucker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM