Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Enterprise Zones

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0150 (SB0174)
Title
More Opportunities for Marylanders Act of 2019
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1162 (SB0656)
Title
Heritage Structure Rehabilitation Tax Credit - Alterations - Opportunity Zones, Targeted Projects, and Transferability
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1309 (SB0876)
Title
Aquaculture - Leases in Water Column - Riparian Right of First Refusal
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1315 /CH0455 (SB0432/CH0454)
Title
Higher Education - Cyber Warrior Diversity Program - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0174 (HB0150)
Title
More Opportunities for Marylanders Act of 2019
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0432 /CH0454 (HB1315/CH0455)
Title
Higher Education - Cyber Warrior Diversity Program - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0581 /CH0211 (HB1260)
Title
Economic, Housing, and Community Development – Opportunity Zone Incentives
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0656 (HB1162)
Title
Heritage Structure Rehabilitation Tax Credit - Alterations - Opportunity Zones, Targeted Projects, and Transferability
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0663
Title
Commerce, Housing, and Community Development - Opportunity Zones
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0876 (HB1309)
Title
Aquaculture - Leases in Water Column - Riparian Right of First Refusal
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0150 (SB0174) More Opportunities for Marylanders Act of 2019 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1162 (SB0656) Heritage Structure Rehabilitation Tax Credit - Alterations - Opportunity Zones, Targeted Projects, and Transferability Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1309 (SB0876) Aquaculture - Leases in Water Column - Riparian Right of First Refusal Delegate Crosby 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1315 /CH0455 (SB0432/CH0454) Higher Education - Cyber Warrior Diversity Program - Revisions Delegate Glenn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 455
Appropriations
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0174 (HB0150) More Opportunities for Marylanders Act of 2019 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0432 /CH0454 (HB1315/CH0455) Higher Education - Cyber Warrior Diversity Program - Revisions Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 454
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0581 /CH0211 (HB1260) Economic, Housing, and Community Development – Opportunity Zone Incentives Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2019 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0656 (HB1162) Heritage Structure Rehabilitation Tax Credit - Alterations - Opportunity Zones, Targeted Projects, and Transferability Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2019 - 1:45 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0663 Commerce, Housing, and Community Development - Opportunity Zones Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0876 (HB1309) Aquaculture - Leases in Water Column - Riparian Right of First Refusal Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 10:00 a.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2019 - 10:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:23 PM