Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Enterprise Zones

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0027 (SB0185/CH0639)
Title
Baltimore County - Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Qualified Opportunity Zones
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0045 /CH0038 (SB0122)
Title
Economic Development - Opportunity Zone Incentives - Alteration of the More Jobs for Marylanders and Opportunity Zone Enhancement Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0223
Title
End Ineffective Business Subsidies Act of 2020
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0224 (SB0263)
Title
Opportunity Zone Tax Deduction Reform Act of 2020
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0565
Title
Income Tax – Business and Economic Development Tax Credits – Termination, Alteration, and Evaluation
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0566 /CH0254 (SB0713/CH0255)
Title
Opportunity Zone Enhancement Program - Eligibility - Lead-Based Paint Affected Properties
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0790
Title
Income Tax - Green Buildings Tax Credit - Multifamily Housing
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1026 /CH0408
Title
Economic Development Programs - Data Collection, Tracking, and Reporting Requirements - Alteration
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1117
Title
Economic Development - Enterprise Zone Program - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1301
Title
Property Tax Credit - Opportunity Zone Property Improvements
Sponsor
Delegate Wells
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1319 /CH0459
Title
Wicomico County – Alcoholic Beverages – Board of License Commissioners
Sponsor
Delegate Anderton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1339 (SB0397/CH0640)
Title
Sales and Use Tax and Personal Property Tax - Exemptions - Data Centers
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0122 (HB0045/CH0038)
Title
Economic Development - Opportunity Zone Incentives - Alteration of the More Jobs for Marylanders and Opportunity Zone Enhancement Programs
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0185 /CH0639 (HB0027)
Title
Sales and Use Tax Exemption – Qualified Opportunity Zones in Baltimore County and Target Redevelopment Areas in Washington County
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0263 (HB0224)
Title
Opportunity Zone Tax Deduction Reform Act of 2020
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0397 /CH0640 (HB1339)
Title
Sales and Use Tax and Personal Property Tax - Exemptions - Data Centers
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0713 /CH0255 (HB0566/CH0254)
Title
Opportunity Zone Enhancement Program - Eligibility - Lead-Based Paint Affected Properties
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0027 (SB0185/CH0639) Baltimore County - Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Qualified Opportunity Zones Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Ways and Means
HB0045 /CH0038 (SB0122) Economic Development - Opportunity Zone Incentives - Alteration of the More Jobs for Marylanders and Opportunity Zone Enhancement Programs Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 38
Ways and Means
1/28/2020 - 1:15 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0223 End Ineffective Business Subsidies Act of 2020 Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0224 (SB0263) Opportunity Zone Tax Deduction Reform Act of 2020 Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0565 Income Tax – Business and Economic Development Tax Credits – Termination, Alteration, and Evaluation Delegate Kaiser 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0566 /CH0254 (SB0713/CH0255) Opportunity Zone Enhancement Program - Eligibility - Lead-Based Paint Affected Properties Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 254
Ways and Means
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Finance
HB0790 Income Tax - Green Buildings Tax Credit - Multifamily Housing Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1026 /CH0408 Economic Development Programs - Data Collection, Tracking, and Reporting Requirements - Alteration Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 408
Ways and Means
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1117 Economic Development - Enterprise Zone Program - Alterations Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1301 Property Tax Credit - Opportunity Zone Property Improvements Delegate Wells 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1319 /CH0459 Wicomico County – Alcoholic Beverages – Board of License Commissioners Delegate Anderton 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 459
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1339 (SB0397/CH0640) Sales and Use Tax and Personal Property Tax - Exemptions - Data Centers Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0122 (HB0045/CH0038) Economic Development - Opportunity Zone Incentives - Alteration of the More Jobs for Marylanders and Opportunity Zone Enhancement Programs Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/15/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0185 /CH0639 (HB0027) Sales and Use Tax Exemption – Qualified Opportunity Zones in Baltimore County and Target Redevelopment Areas in Washington County Senator Jennings 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 639
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0263 (HB0224) Opportunity Zone Tax Deduction Reform Act of 2020 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
SB0397 /CH0640 (HB1339) Sales and Use Tax and Personal Property Tax - Exemptions - Data Centers Senator Hershey 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 640
Budget and Taxation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0713 /CH0255 (HB0566/CH0254) Opportunity Zone Enhancement Program - Eligibility - Lead-Based Paint Affected Properties Senator Carter 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 255
Finance
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/1/2020 2:19 PM