Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Enterprise Zones

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0262 (SB0113)
Title
Opportunity Zone Tax Deduction Reform Act of 2021
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0805
Title
Economic Development - Enterprise Zone Program - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1253 (SB0509)
Title
National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program - Eligibility
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1258
Title
Health Enterprise Zones - Established (Restoring the Promise Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1279 (SB0778)
Title
Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0113 (HB0262)
Title
Opportunity Zone Tax Deduction Reform Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0306
Title
Enterprise Zones - Reimbursements to Local Governments - Request Deadline and Recovery of Overpayment
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0365
Title
Neighborhood Business Development Program - Food Desert Projects - Business Retention
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0509 (HB1253)
Title
National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program - Eligibility
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0778 (HB1279)
Title
Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program – Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0262 (SB0113) Opportunity Zone Tax Deduction Reform Act of 2021 Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
1/21/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0805 Economic Development - Enterprise Zone Program - Alterations Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1253 (SB0509) National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program - Eligibility Delegate Washington 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1258 Health Enterprise Zones - Established (Restoring the Promise Act of 2021) Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1279 (SB0778) Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program - Alterations Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0113 (HB0262) Opportunity Zone Tax Deduction Reform Act of 2021 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0306 Enterprise Zones - Reimbursements to Local Governments - Request Deadline and Recovery of Overpayment Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0365 Neighborhood Business Development Program - Food Desert Projects - Business Retention Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0509 (HB1253) National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program - Eligibility Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0778 (HB1279) Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program – Alterations Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2021 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 2/24/2021 1:46 PM
Click to return on the top page