Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Environmental Health -see also- Pollution

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0016 (SB0261)
Title
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted Regulations
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0095 /CH0608
Title
Environment - Permits - New Source Performance Standards
Sponsor
Chair, Environmental Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0102 /CH0425 (SB0127)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0917
Title
Real Property - Property Used for Methamphetamine Production - Disclosure and Quarantine
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0986 /CH0397 (SB0896)
Title
State Board of Pharmacy - Sterile Compounding - Permits
Sponsor
Delegate Hammen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1115 /CH0404 (SB0593)
Title
Health Occupations Boards - License Renewal, Investigation of Alleged Violations, and Immunity from Liability
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1134
Title
Task Force to Study the Impact of the Heat Island Effect on Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0261 (HB0016)
Title
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted Regulations
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0400 /CH0254
Title
Environmental Health Specialists - Licensure Examinations - Applicant Qualifications and Waiver
Sponsor
Senator Glassman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0593 (HB1115/CH0404)
Title
Health Occupations Boards - License Renewal, Investigation of Alleged Violations, and Immunity from Liability
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0601
Title
Maryland Hydraulic Fracturing Moratorium and Right to Know Act of 2013
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0879
Title
Natural Gas Severance Tax and Impact Account
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0896 (HB0986/CH0397)
Title
State Board of Pharmacy - Sterile Compounding - Permits
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1029 /CH0339
Title
Maryland Agricultural Certainty Program
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0016 (SB0261) State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted Regulations Delegate Arora 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
1/31/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0095 /CH0608 Environment - Permits - New Source Performance Standards Chair, Environmental Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 608
Environmental Matters
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0102 /CH0425 (SB0127) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425
Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0917 Real Property - Property Used for Methamphetamine Production - Disclosure and Quarantine Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
3/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
HB0986 /CH0397 (SB0896) State Board of Pharmacy - Sterile Compounding - Permits Delegate Hammen 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 397
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1115 /CH0404 (SB0593) Health Occupations Boards - License Renewal, Investigation of Alleged Violations, and Immunity from Liability Delegate Cullison 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 404
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Judicial Proceedings
HB1134 Task Force to Study the Impact of the Heat Island Effect on Maryland Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0261 (HB0016) State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted Regulations Senator Young 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0400 /CH0254 Environmental Health Specialists - Licensure Examinations - Applicant Qualifications and Waiver Senator Glassman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 254
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0593 (HB1115/CH0404) Health Occupations Boards - License Renewal, Investigation of Alleged Violations, and Immunity from Liability Senator Montgomery 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0601 Maryland Hydraulic Fracturing Moratorium and Right to Know Act of 2013 Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0879 Natural Gas Severance Tax and Impact Account Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0896 (HB0986/CH0397) State Board of Pharmacy - Sterile Compounding - Permits Senator Conway 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB1029 /CH0339 Maryland Agricultural Certainty Program Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 339
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM