Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Environmental Health -see also- Pollution

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0026
Title
Clean Indoor Air Act - Use of Electronic Smoking Devices - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0216 /CH0409 (SB0200)
Title
Environment - Personal Care Products Containing Synthetic Plastic Microbeads - Prohibition on Manufacturing or Sale
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0449 /CH0481 (SB0409/CH0480)
Title
Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing - Regulations
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0514 /CH0429 (SB0258)
Title
Maryland Commission on Climate Change
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0556 /CH0094
Title
State Board of Environmental Health Specialists - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0881 (SB0256)
Title
Maryland Shoreline Risk Assessment, Preparation, and Adaptation Act
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0952
Title
Public Health - Hydraulic Fracturing Chemicals - Information and Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0987 (SB0693)
Title
Environment - Ambient Air Quality Control - Cumulative Air Impact Analysis
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1042
Title
Environment - Nitrogen Oxide Emissions - Pollution and Combustion Control Technologies
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0200 (HB0216/CH0409)
Title
Environment - Personal Care Products Containing Synthetic Plastic Microbeads - Prohibition on Manufacturing or Sale
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0256 (HB0881)
Title
Maryland Shoreline Risk Assessment, Preparation, and Adaptation Act
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0258 (HB0514/CH0429)
Title
Maryland Commission on Climate Change
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0409 /CH0480 (HB0449/CH0481)
Title
Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing - Regulations
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0693 (HB0987)
Title
Environment - Ambient Air Quality Control - Cumulative Air Impact Analysis
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0712
Title
Natural Gas Severance Tax and Impact Account
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0854
Title
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted Regulations
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0919 (HB1268)
Title
Environment - Implementation of Watershed Implementation Plan - Limitation
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0026 Clean Indoor Air Act - Use of Electronic Smoking Devices - Prohibition Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0216 /CH0409 (SB0200) Environment - Personal Care Products Containing Synthetic Plastic Microbeads - Prohibition on Manufacturing or Sale Delegate Morhaim 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 409
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0449 /CH0481 (SB0409/CH0480) Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing - Regulations Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 481
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0514 /CH0429 (SB0258) Maryland Commission on Climate Change Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 429
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0556 /CH0094 State Board of Environmental Health Specialists - Revisions Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0881 (SB0256) Maryland Shoreline Risk Assessment, Preparation, and Adaptation Act Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0952 Public Health - Hydraulic Fracturing Chemicals - Information and Fund Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0987 (SB0693) Environment - Ambient Air Quality Control - Cumulative Air Impact Analysis Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1042 Environment - Nitrogen Oxide Emissions - Pollution and Combustion Control Technologies Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0200 (HB0216/CH0409) Environment - Personal Care Products Containing Synthetic Plastic Microbeads - Prohibition on Manufacturing or Sale Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0256 (HB0881) Maryland Shoreline Risk Assessment, Preparation, and Adaptation Act Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0258 (HB0514/CH0429) Maryland Commission on Climate Change Senator Pinsky 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0409 /CH0480 (HB0449/CH0481) Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing - Regulations Senator Montgomery 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 480
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0693 (HB0987) Environment - Ambient Air Quality Control - Cumulative Air Impact Analysis Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0712 Natural Gas Severance Tax and Impact Account Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0854 State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted Regulations Senator Young 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0919 (HB1268) Environment - Implementation of Watershed Implementation Plan - Limitation Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM