Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Environmental Health -see also- Pollution

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0061
Title
Environment - Solid Waste, Recycling, and Anaerobic Digestion
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0394
Title
Public Health - Hydraulic Fracturing Chemicals - Information and Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0497 /CH0360 (SB0200/CH0359)
Title
Health Occupations - State Board of Environmental Health Specialists - Sunset Extension and Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Hammen
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0571
Title
Gas Companies - Rate Regulation - Environmental Remediation Costs
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0599 (SB0496)
Title
Poultry Litter Management Act
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0610 (SB0323/CH0011)
Title
Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reduction Act - Reauthorization
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0670 /CH0274
Title
Baltimore City - Remediation of Illegal Dumping - Report
Sponsor
Delegate McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0787
Title
Electricity - Energy Storage Systems (Storage Technology and Electric Power (STEP) Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0821
Title
Energy Storage Portfolio Standard (Storage Technology and Electric Power (STEP) Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1128 /CH0501
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Drinking Water - Testing PG/MC 113-16
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1193 (SB0067)
Title
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted Regulations
Sponsor
Delegate Platt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1391
Title
Large Family Child Care Homes and Child Care Centers - Green Product Cleaning Supplies - Regulations
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0067 (HB1193)
Title
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted Regulations
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0200 /CH0359 (HB0497/CH0360)
Title
Health Occupations - State Board of Environmental Health Specialists - Sunset Extension and Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Conway
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0323 /CH0011 (HB0610)
Title
Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reduction Act - Reauthorization
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0496 (HB0599)
Title
Poultry Litter Management Act
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0061 Environment - Solid Waste, Recycling, and Anaerobic Digestion Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Pinsky)
Environment and Transportation
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0394 Public Health - Hydraulic Fracturing Chemicals - Information and Fund Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0497 /CH0360 (SB0200/CH0359) Health Occupations - State Board of Environmental Health Specialists - Sunset Extension and Revisions Delegate Hammen 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 360
Health and Government Operations
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0571 Gas Companies - Rate Regulation - Environmental Remediation Costs Delegate Barkley 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Middleton)
Economic Matters
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0599 (SB0496) Poultry Litter Management Act Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0610 (SB0323/CH0011) Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reduction Act - Reauthorization Delegate Barve 2 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Economic Matters
2/26/2016 - 12:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0670 /CH0274 Baltimore City - Remediation of Illegal Dumping - Report Delegate McCray 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 274
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0787 Electricity - Energy Storage Systems (Storage Technology and Electric Power (STEP) Act) Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0821 Energy Storage Portfolio Standard (Storage Technology and Electric Power (STEP) Act) Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1128 /CH0501 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Drinking Water - Testing PG/MC 113-16 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 501
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1193 (SB0067) State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted Regulations Delegate Platt 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1391 Large Family Child Care Homes and Child Care Centers - Green Product Cleaning Supplies - Regulations Delegate Angel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0067 (HB1193) State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted Regulations Senator Young 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-0)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0200 /CH0359 (HB0497/CH0360) Health Occupations - State Board of Environmental Health Specialists - Sunset Extension and Revisions Senator Conway 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 359
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0323 /CH0011 (HB0610) Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reduction Act - Reauthorization Senator Pinsky 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 11
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Environment and Transportation
SB0496 (HB0599) Poultry Litter Management Act Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM