Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Environmental Service, Maryland

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0132 /CH0614
Title
State Government - Pollinator Habitat Plans
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0795
Title
Maryland Environmental Service - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0447
Title
Maryland Environmental Service - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0132 /CH0614 State Government - Pollinator Habitat Plans Delegate Lafferty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 614
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0795 Maryland Environmental Service - Collective Bargaining Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Appropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0447 Maryland Environmental Service - Collective Bargaining Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM
Click to return on the top page