Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Environmental Trust

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0002 (SB0615)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation Easements
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0600 /CH0370
Title
Chesapeake Bay Trust and Chesapeake Conservation Corps - Funding
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0615 (HB0002)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation Easements
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0002 (SB0615) Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation Easements Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0600 /CH0370 Chesapeake Bay Trust and Chesapeake Conservation Corps - Funding Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 370
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0615 (HB0002) Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation Easements Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM