Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Environmental Trust

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0324 (SB0301)
Title
State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Costs and Frequency of Audits
Sponsor
Chair, Joint Audit and Evaluation Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0899
Title
Illegal Dumping and Litter Control - Criminal Penalties and Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0148 (HB0125)
Title
Board of Public Works - Land Acquisition - Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0301 (HB0324)
Title
State Government – Office of Legislative Audits – Costs of Audits
Sponsor
Chair, Joint Audit and Evaluation Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0324 (SB0301) State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Costs and Frequency of Audits Chair, Joint Audit and Evaluation Committee 6 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Appropriations
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0899 Illegal Dumping and Litter Control - Criminal Penalties and Fund Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0148 (HB0125) Board of Public Works - Land Acquisition - Requirements Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0301 (HB0324) State Government – Office of Legislative Audits – Costs of Audits Chair, Joint Audit and Evaluation Committee 6 2 In the Senate - Senate Requests House Recede
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/18/2020 5:07 PM