Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Erosion -see also- Sediment Control; Shore Erosion

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0058 /CH0380 (SB0073)
Title
Talbot County - Chesapeake Bay Critical Area - Prosecution or Civil Suit for Certain Violations
Sponsor
Delegate Haddaway-Riccio
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0878 /CH0430 (SB0814)
Title
State Highway Administration - Compost and Compost-Based Products - Specification
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1463 (SB1020)
Title
Solar Farms - Construction Requirements - Exemptions
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0073 (HB0058/CH0380)
Title
Talbot County - Chesapeake Bay Critical Area - Prosecution or Civil Suit for Certain Violations
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0814 (HB0878/CH0430)
Title
State Highway Administration - Compost and Compost-Based Products - Specification
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1020 (HB1463)
Title
Solar Farms - Construction Requirements - Exemptions
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0058 /CH0380 (SB0073) Talbot County - Chesapeake Bay Critical Area - Prosecution or Civil Suit for Certain Violations Delegate Haddaway-Riccio 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 380
Environmental Matters
1/29/2014 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0878 /CH0430 (SB0814) State Highway Administration - Compost and Compost-Based Products - Specification Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Environmental Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2014 - 1:45 PM
HB1463 (SB1020) Solar Farms - Construction Requirements - Exemptions Delegate Davis 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0073 (HB0058/CH0380) Talbot County - Chesapeake Bay Critical Area - Prosecution or Civil Suit for Certain Violations Senator Colburn 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0814 (HB0878/CH0430) State Highway Administration - Compost and Compost-Based Products - Specification Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1020 (HB1463) Solar Farms - Construction Requirements - Exemptions Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM