Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Escrow Accounts

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0226 /CH0003 (SB0275)
Title
Maryland Offshore Wind Energy Act of 2013
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0293
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Retention of Percentage of Contract - Security
Sponsor
Delegate Hubbard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1187 (SB0887/CH0572)
Title
Public Utilities - Solar Photovoltaic Systems
Sponsor
Delegate Hucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0140 /CH0023
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Retention of Percentage of Contract - Security
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0275 (HB0226/CH0003)
Title
Maryland Offshore Wind Energy Act of 2013
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0854 /CH0568
Title
Environment - Gas and Oil Drilling - Financial Assurance
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0887 /CH0572 (HB1187)
Title
Public Utilities - Solar Photovoltaic Systems
Sponsor
Senator Garagiola
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0226 /CH0003 (SB0275) Maryland Offshore Wind Energy Act of 2013 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 3
Economic Matters
2/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0293 State Finance and Procurement - Retention of Percentage of Contract - Security Delegate Hubbard 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1187 (SB0887/CH0572) Public Utilities - Solar Photovoltaic Systems Delegate Hucker 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Economic Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Rules
SB0140 /CH0023 State Finance and Procurement - Retention of Percentage of Contract - Security Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 23
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/2013 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0275 (HB0226/CH0003) Maryland Offshore Wind Energy Act of 2013 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0854 /CH0568 Environment - Gas and Oil Drilling - Financial Assurance Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 568
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0887 /CH0572 (HB1187) Public Utilities - Solar Photovoltaic Systems Senator Garagiola 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 572
Finance
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM