Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Escrow Accounts

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0593 (SB0415/CH0497)
Title
Morticians and Funeral Directors - Pre-Need Contracts
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0735 (SB0583/CH0306)
Title
Financial Institutions - Interest Payable on Escrow Accounts and Specific Purpose Savings Accounts
Sponsor
Delegate Olszewski
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1045 /CH0634
Title
Real Property - Lien Priority of Refinance Mortgages - Escrow Costs
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1082 /CH0351 (SB0881/CH0350)
Title
Title Insurers - Statutory or Unearned Premium Reserves
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1365
Title
Corporations and Associations - Securities - Maryland Small Business Funding Act
Sponsor
Delegate Schuh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0415 /CH0497 (HB0593)
Title
Morticians and Funeral Directors - Pre-Need Contracts
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0583 /CH0306 (HB0735)
Title
Financial Institutions - Interest Payable on Escrow Accounts and Specific Purpose Savings Accounts
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0881 /CH0350 (HB1082/CH0351)
Title
Title Insurers - Statutory or Unearned Premium Reserves
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0593 (SB0415/CH0497) Morticians and Funeral Directors - Pre-Need Contracts Delegate Krebs 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0735 (SB0583/CH0306) Financial Institutions - Interest Payable on Escrow Accounts and Specific Purpose Savings Accounts Delegate Olszewski 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1045 /CH0634 Real Property - Lien Priority of Refinance Mortgages - Escrow Costs Delegate Arora 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 634
Environmental Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1082 /CH0351 (SB0881/CH0350) Title Insurers - Statutory or Unearned Premium Reserves Delegate Jameson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Economic Matters
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1365 Corporations and Associations - Securities - Maryland Small Business Funding Act Delegate Schuh 2 2 In the House - Hearing cancelled
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0415 /CH0497 (HB0593) Morticians and Funeral Directors - Pre-Need Contracts Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 497
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0583 /CH0306 (HB0735) Financial Institutions - Interest Payable on Escrow Accounts and Specific Purpose Savings Accounts Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 306
Finance
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0881 /CH0350 (HB1082/CH0351) Title Insurers - Statutory or Unearned Premium Reserves Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 350
Finance
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM