Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Estate Tax

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0308 /CH0021 (SB0646/CH0015)
Title
Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit
Sponsor
Delegate Tarlau
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0777 (SB0649)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0561
Title
Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0646 /CH0015 (HB0308/CH0021)
Title
Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0649 (HB0777)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0308 /CH0021 (SB0646/CH0015) Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit Delegate Tarlau 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 21
Ways and Means
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0777 (SB0649) Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0561 Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0646 /CH0015 (HB0308/CH0021) Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit Senator Madaleno 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 15
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0649 (HB0777) Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM