Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Estate Tax

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0055 (SB0998)
Title
Vessels - Certificate of Title - Transfer-on-Death Beneficiary Designation
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0219 /CH0111
Title
Maryland Estate Tax - Portability
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0243 (SB0483)
Title
Cemeteries - Perpetual Care - Distribution From Perpetual Care Trust Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0256
Title
Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0483 (HB0243)
Title
Cemeteries - Perpetual Care - Distribution From Perpetual Care Trust Fund
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0998 (HB0055)
Title
Vessels - Certificate of Title - Transfer-on-Death Beneficiary Designation
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0055 (SB0998) Vessels - Certificate of Title - Transfer-on-Death Beneficiary Designation Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
1/29/2020 - 2:00 PM
HB0219 /CH0111 Maryland Estate Tax - Portability Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 111
Ways and Means
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0243 (SB0483) Cemeteries - Perpetual Care - Distribution From Perpetual Care Trust Fund Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0256 Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0483 (HB0243) Cemeteries - Perpetual Care - Distribution From Perpetual Care Trust Fund Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0998 (HB0055) Vessels - Certificate of Title - Transfer-on-Death Beneficiary Designation Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/1/2020 2:15 PM