Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Ethnic Affairs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0034 /CH0347 (SB0017)
Title
State Government - Commemorative Month - German-American Heritage Month
Sponsor
Delegate Aumann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0077 /CH0607 (SB0007)
Title
State Government - Commemorative Month - Irish American Heritage Month
Sponsor
Delegate McHale
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0361 /CH0368
Title
Health Insurance - Conformity with and Implementation of Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0939 (SB0402)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Wasserman Residence Phase 2 Renovations
Sponsor
Delegate Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1372 /CH0430 (SB0934)
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1468 (SB1007)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Queen Anne's County - Kennard High School Restoration Project
Sponsor
Delegate Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0007 (HB0077/CH0607)
Title
State Government - Commemorative Month - Irish American Heritage Month
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0017 (HB0034/CH0347)
Title
State Government - Commemorative Day - German-American Heritage Day
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0402 (HB0939)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Wasserman Residence Phase 2 Renovations
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0934 (HB1372/CH0430)
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1007 (HB1468)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Queen Anne's County - Kennard High School Restoration Project
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0034 /CH0347 (SB0017) State Government - Commemorative Month - German-American Heritage Month Delegate Aumann 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 347
Health and Government Operations
1/24/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0077 /CH0607 (SB0007) State Government - Commemorative Month - Irish American Heritage Month Delegate McHale 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 607
Health and Government Operations
1/31/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0361 /CH0368 Health Insurance - Conformity with and Implementation of Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 368
Health and Government Operations
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0939 (SB0402) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Wasserman Residence Phase 2 Renovations Delegate Lee 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2013 - 10:00 AM
HB1372 /CH0430 (SB0934) Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations Delegate Jones 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1468 (SB1007) Creation of a State Debt - Queen Anne's County - Kennard High School Restoration Project Delegate Eckardt 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 9:00 AM
SB0007 (HB0077/CH0607) State Government - Commemorative Month - Irish American Heritage Month Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0017 (HB0034/CH0347) State Government - Commemorative Day - German-American Heritage Day Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0402 (HB0939) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Wasserman Residence Phase 2 Renovations Senator Frosh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2013 - 11:00 AM
SB0934 (HB1372/CH0430) Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1007 (HB1468) Creation of a State Debt - Queen Anne's County - Kennard High School Restoration Project Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2013 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM