Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Ethnic Affairs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0040 /CH0582 (SB0593)
Title
State Government - Commemorative Months - American Indian Heritage Month
Sponsor
Delegate Murphy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0041
Title
Maryland Indian Status - Standards for Recognition
Sponsor
Delegate Murphy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0169
Title
Health Insurance - Rollback of Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act Conforming Provisions
Sponsor
Delegate Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0475 (SB0588)
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - South Asian American Heritage Day
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0495 (SB0352)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Melvin J. Berman Hebrew Academy
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0706 (SB0984)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Silver Spring Learning Center Expansion
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0751 (SB0323)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Jewish Social Service Agency Montrose Office Renovation
Sponsor
Delegate Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0762
Title
State Government - Commemorative Days - Diwali Day
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1095
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Piscataway Indian Museum
Sponsor
Delegate Proctor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1116
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2012 - Charles County - Heritage House
Sponsor
Delegate Proctor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1349 /CH0249 (SB0868)
Title
Public Safety Diversity Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1404
Title
Health Care Disparities, Cultural and Linguistic Competency, and Health Literacy - Continuing Education
Sponsor
Delegate Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0005
Title
Changing the Name of the Washington, D.C., Professional Football Team
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0096 /CH0023
Title
Health Insurance - Conformity With and Implementation of the Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0323 (HB0751)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Jewish Social Service Agency Montrose Office Renovation
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0352 (HB0495)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Melvin J. Berman Hebrew Academy
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0541 (HB1548)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Experience Salubria Project
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0588 (HB0475)
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - South Asian American Heritage Day
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0593 (HB0040/CH0582)
Title
State Government - Commemorative Months - American Indian Heritage Month
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0868 (HB1349/CH0249)
Title
Public Safety Diversity Act of 2014
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0984 (HB0706)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Silver Spring Learning Center Expansion
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0040 /CH0582 (SB0593) State Government - Commemorative Months - American Indian Heritage Month Delegate Murphy 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 582
Health and Government Operations
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0041 Maryland Indian Status - Standards for Recognition Delegate Murphy 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0169 Health Insurance - Rollback of Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act Conforming Provisions Delegate Hough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2014 - 12:30 PM
HB0475 (SB0588) General Provisions - Commemorative Days - South Asian American Heritage Day Delegate Arora 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0495 (SB0352) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Melvin J. Berman Hebrew Academy Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB0706 (SB0984) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Silver Spring Learning Center Expansion Delegate Arora 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2014 - 10:30 AM
HB0751 (SB0323) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Jewish Social Service Agency Montrose Office Renovation Delegate Lee 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2014 - 10:30 AM
HB0762 State Government - Commemorative Days - Diwali Day Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1095 Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Piscataway Indian Museum Delegate Proctor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 9:00 AM
HB1116 Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2012 - Charles County - Heritage House Delegate Proctor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1349 /CH0249 (SB0868) Public Safety Diversity Act of 2014 Delegate Braveboy 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 249
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Finance
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1404 Health Care Disparities, Cultural and Linguistic Competency, and Health Literacy - Continuing Education Delegate Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HJ0005 Changing the Name of the Washington, D.C., Professional Football Team Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0096 /CH0023 Health Insurance - Conformity With and Implementation of the Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 23
Finance
1/15/2014 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0323 (HB0751) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Jewish Social Service Agency Montrose Office Renovation Senator Frosh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 9:30 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2014 - 9:30 AM
SB0352 (HB0495) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Melvin J. Berman Hebrew Academy Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
SB0541 (HB1548) Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Experience Salubria Project Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 9:30 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2014 - 9:30 AM
SB0588 (HB0475) General Provisions - Commemorative Days - South Asian American Heritage Day Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0593 (HB0040/CH0582) State Government - Commemorative Months - American Indian Heritage Month Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0868 (HB1349/CH0249) Public Safety Diversity Act of 2014 Senator Benson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0984 (HB0706) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Silver Spring Learning Center Expansion Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 9:30 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2014 - 9:30 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM