Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Ethnic Affairs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0539
Title
Election Law - Voter Registration and Absentee Voting - Proof of Citizenship
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0732 (SB0504)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Young Israel Shomrai Emunah Social Hall
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0814 (SB0729)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Korean Community Service Center Branch Office
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1222
Title
Maryland School Discipline Reform Act
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1225 /CH0558 (SB0340/CH0559)
Title
University of Maryland School of Public Health, Center for Health Equity - Workgroup on Health in All Policies
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1268
Title
Education - Student Achievement Gap Standard - Establishment (Maryland Student Achievement Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1519 (SB0471)
Title
Morgan State University - Task Force on Reconciliation and Equity
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1635
Title
Baltimore Police Department - Reporting on Community Policing
Sponsor
Delegate Ali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1648
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Diversity
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1660 (SB0695)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - National Great Blacks in Wax Museum
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0244
Title
Task Force to Study Suspension Rates of African American Prekindergarten Students
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0340 /CH0559 (HB1225/CH0558)
Title
University of Maryland School of Public Health, Center for Health Equity - Workgroup on Health in All Policies
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0471 (HB1519)
Title
Morgan State University - Task Force on Reconciliation and Equity
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0503 /CH0499
Title
Health Occupations Boards - Racial and Ethnic Health Disparities
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0504 (HB0732)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Young Israel Shomrai Emunah Social Hall
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0695 (HB1660)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - National Great Blacks in Wax Museum
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0729 (HB0814)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Korean Community Service Center Branch Office
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1197
Title
Public Health - Maryland Medical Cannabis Commission - Membership, Licensing, and Studies
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0539 Election Law - Voter Registration and Absentee Voting - Proof of Citizenship Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0732 (SB0504) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Young Israel Shomrai Emunah Social Hall Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/13/2017 - 11:30 AM
HB0814 (SB0729) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Korean Community Service Center Branch Office Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/13/2017 - 11:30 AM
HB1222 Maryland School Discipline Reform Act Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1225 /CH0558 (SB0340/CH0559) University of Maryland School of Public Health, Center for Health Equity - Workgroup on Health in All Policies Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 558
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1268 Education - Student Achievement Gap Standard - Establishment (Maryland Student Achievement Act) Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1519 (SB0471) Morgan State University - Task Force on Reconciliation and Equity Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1635 Baltimore Police Department - Reporting on Community Policing Delegate Ali 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1648 Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Diversity Delegate Angel 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1660 (SB0695) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - National Great Blacks in Wax Museum Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0244 Task Force to Study Suspension Rates of African American Prekindergarten Students Senator Robinson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/01/2017 - 2:00 PM
SB0340 /CH0559 (HB1225/CH0558) University of Maryland School of Public Health, Center for Health Equity - Workgroup on Health in All Policies Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 559
Finance
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0471 (HB1519) Morgan State University - Task Force on Reconciliation and Equity Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0503 /CH0499 Health Occupations Boards - Racial and Ethnic Health Disparities Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 499
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0504 (HB0732) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Young Israel Shomrai Emunah Social Hall Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 10:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2017 - 10:00 AM
SB0695 (HB1660) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - National Great Blacks in Wax Museum Senator McFadden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 3:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 3:00 PM
SB0729 (HB0814) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Korean Community Service Center Branch Office Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 10:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2017 - 10:00 AM
SB1197 Public Health - Maryland Medical Cannabis Commission - Membership, Licensing, and Studies Senator Miller 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM