Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Ethnic Affairs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0039
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Diversity
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0436
Title
Baltimore Police Department - Reporting on Community Policing
Sponsor
Delegate Ali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0450 (SB0252)
Title
Historically Black Institutions - State Funding - Blount-Rawlings-Britt HBI Comparability Program
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0716 /CH0082 (SB0266/CH0083)
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Mortality Rates of African American Infants and Infants in Rural Areas - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1062 (SB0827)
Title
Historically Black Colleges and Universities – Appointment of a Special Advisor – Development of a Remedial Plan (HBCU Equity Act of 2018)
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1159 /CH0154 (SB0066/CH0155)
Title
Health – Vital Statistics – Veteran and Armed Services Member Suicide Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1603 (SB1109)
Title
Justice Reinvestment Oversight Board - Data Collection on Race and Ethnicity
Sponsor
Delegate Sanchez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1665
Title
Income Tax Credit - Endowments of Maryland Historically Black Colleges and Universities
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1762 (SB1199)
Title
General Provisions – Commemorative Days – Pongal Day
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0008 /JR0001 (SJ0006/JR0002)
Title
Commemorating the Bicentennial of the Birth of Frederick Douglass
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0066 /CH0155 (HB1159/CH0154)
Title
Health – Vital Statistics – Veteran and Armed Services Member Suicide Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0252 (HB0450)
Title
Historically Black Institutions - State Funding - Blount-Rawlings-Britt HBI Comparability Program
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0266 /CH0083 (HB0716/CH0082)
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission – Mortality Rates of African American Infants and Infants in Rural Areas – Study
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0350 /CH0417
Title
Morgan State University - Task Force on Reconciliation and Equity
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0525
Title
Public Institutions of Higher Education – Discriminatory Harassment
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0737
Title
State Finance and Procurement - State-Funded Entities - Diversity in Advertising
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0827 (HB1062)
Title
Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Appointment of a Special Advisor - Development of a Remedial Plan (HBCU Equity Act of 2018)
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1109 (HB1603)
Title
Task Force to Standardize Data Collection on Race and Ethnicity
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1199 (HB1762)
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Pongal Day
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0006 /JR0002 (HJ0008/JR0001)
Title
Commemorating the Bicentennial of the Birth of Frederick Douglass
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0039 Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Diversity Delegate Angel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0436 Baltimore Police Department - Reporting on Community Policing Delegate Ali 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0450 (SB0252) Historically Black Institutions - State Funding - Blount-Rawlings-Britt HBI Comparability Program Delegate Mosby 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 2:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/08/2018 - 2:00 PM
HB0716 /CH0082 (SB0266/CH0083) Maryland Health Care Commission - Mortality Rates of African American Infants and Infants in Rural Areas - Study Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 82
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1062 (SB0827) Historically Black Colleges and Universities – Appointment of a Special Advisor – Development of a Remedial Plan (HBCU Equity Act of 2018) Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:15 p.m.
Appropriations
3/01/2018 - 1:15 PM
HB1159 /CH0154 (SB0066/CH0155) Health – Vital Statistics – Veteran and Armed Services Member Suicide Reporting Delegate Young, P. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 154
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1603 (SB1109) Justice Reinvestment Oversight Board - Data Collection on Race and Ethnicity Delegate Sanchez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1665 Income Tax Credit - Endowments of Maryland Historically Black Colleges and Universities Delegate Mosby 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1762 (SB1199) General Provisions – Commemorative Days – Pongal Day Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HJ0008 /JR0001 (SJ0006/JR0002) Commemorating the Bicentennial of the Birth of Frederick Douglass Delegate Mautz 2 2 Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 1
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/19/2018 - 3:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0066 /CH0155 (HB1159/CH0154) Health – Vital Statistics – Veteran and Armed Services Member Suicide Reporting Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 155
Finance
2/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0252 (HB0450) Historically Black Institutions - State Funding - Blount-Rawlings-Britt HBI Comparability Program Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/30/2018 - 1:30 PM
SB0266 /CH0083 (HB0716/CH0082) Maryland Health Care Commission – Mortality Rates of African American Infants and Infants in Rural Areas – Study Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 83
Finance
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0350 /CH0417 Morgan State University - Task Force on Reconciliation and Equity Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 417
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/07/2018 - 12:45 PM
Appropriations
3/20/2018 - 1:15 PM
SB0525 Public Institutions of Higher Education – Discriminatory Harassment Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0737 State Finance and Procurement - State-Funded Entities - Diversity in Advertising Senator Robinson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0827 (HB1062) Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Appointment of a Special Advisor - Development of a Remedial Plan (HBCU Equity Act of 2018) Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB1109 (HB1603) Task Force to Standardize Data Collection on Race and Ethnicity Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1199 (HB1762) General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Pongal Day Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
SJ0006 /JR0002 (HJ0008/JR0001) Commemorating the Bicentennial of the Birth of Frederick Douglass Senator Eckardt 2 2 Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 2
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/30/2018 - 11:30 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM