Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Eviction

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0315
Title
Residential Leases - Rent Stabilization and Just Cause Evictions
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0968
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Commencement of Actions to Repossess
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1222
Title
Real Property - Landlord Defenses in Nuisance Actions
Sponsor
Delegate Weir
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1308 /CH0515 (SB0642/CH0514)
Title
Residential Property - Prohibition on Nonjudicial Evictions
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0407
Title
Real Property - Right to Redemption of Leased Premises - Forms of Payment
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0642 /CH0514 (HB1308/CH0515)
Title
Residential Property - Prohibition on Nonjudicial Evictions
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0315 Residential Leases - Rent Stabilization and Just Cause Evictions Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0968 Landlord and Tenant - Commencement of Actions to Repossess Delegate Niemann 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1222 Real Property - Landlord Defenses in Nuisance Actions Delegate Weir 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1308 /CH0515 (SB0642/CH0514) Residential Property - Prohibition on Nonjudicial Evictions Delegate Healey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 515
Environmental Matters
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0407 Real Property - Right to Redemption of Leased Premises - Forms of Payment Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0642 /CH0514 (HB1308/CH0515) Residential Property - Prohibition on Nonjudicial Evictions Senator Muse 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 514
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM