Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Eviction

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0494 (SB0555)
Title
Safe Neighborhoods Act
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0680 (SB0021)
Title
Maryland Cooperative Housing Act - Dispute Settlement and Eviction Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0995
Title
Montgomery County - Residential Leases - Just Cause Eviction MC 15-18
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1553 /CH0637 (SB0826/CH0638)
Title
Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant - False Representations and Unlawful Evictions
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0021 (HB0680)
Title
Maryland Cooperative Housing Act - Dispute Settlement and Eviction Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0555 (HB0494)
Title
Safe Neighborhoods Act
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0826 /CH0638 (HB1553/CH0637)
Title
Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant - False Representations and Unlawful Evictions
Sponsor
Senator Conway
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0494 (SB0555) Safe Neighborhoods Act Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Failed (20-22)
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0680 (SB0021) Maryland Cooperative Housing Act - Dispute Settlement and Eviction Procedures Delegate Healey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0995 Montgomery County - Residential Leases - Just Cause Eviction MC 15-18 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1553 /CH0637 (SB0826/CH0638) Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant - False Representations and Unlawful Evictions Delegate Anderson 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 637
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0021 (HB0680) Maryland Cooperative Housing Act - Dispute Settlement and Eviction Procedures Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0555 (HB0494) Safe Neighborhoods Act Senator Hough 2 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0826 /CH0638 (HB1553/CH0637) Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant - False Representations and Unlawful Evictions Senator Conway 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 638
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM